U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00018
  • Case Name: in re: Graciano Soto Solis El
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 13, 2022: [Fee Received]
  • July 08, 2022: [Complaint Deficiency Notice]
  • July 07, 2022: [ECF - Wrong Division Error]
  • July 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.