U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01644-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 26, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 26, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 24, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.