U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03222
  • Case Name: Neal v. Vaughan
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 09, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 09, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 08, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.