U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01620-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Beard
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Plea and Sentence ]
December, 2022
  • December 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 25, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • July 25, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • July 08, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.