U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03223
  • Case Name: Massey v. Moore et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 16, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 16, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 12, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Motion No Longer Submitted]
  • August 11, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • August 11, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 08, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 26, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 26, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 11, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 11, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.