U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03224
  • Case Name: Taffe v. Scott
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 12, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 12, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 20, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 29, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 03, 2022: [Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 11, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 11, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.