U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03225
  • Case Name: Blakney v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • September 27, 2022: [Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem]
  • September 13, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • September 13, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 09, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Document]
  • August 31, 2022: [Request for Production of Documents]
  • August 31, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 08, 2022: [Document]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 27, 2022: [Request for Production of Documents]
  • July 27, 2022: [Document]
  • July 27, 2022: [Compel]
  • July 12, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 12, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • July 11, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 11, 2022: [Document]
  • July 11, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 11, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.