U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cross
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Dismiss ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 23, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 19, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • July 12, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.