U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Amended Motion for Revocation of Probation]
  • April 10, 2025: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Add Counts]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 19, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 12, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • July 12, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.