U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03226
  • Case Name: Martin v. King et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 03, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 02, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 02, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • July 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 12, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • July 12, 2022: [Complaint]
  • July 12, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.