U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02120
  • Case Name: Stroupe v. Unknown Respondent
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 04, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 01, 2022: [Response to Order]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 12, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 12, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.