U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01652-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 27, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 27, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • July 27, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • July 12, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.