U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01634-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Montgomery
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • July 26, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • July 12, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.