U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01631-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Judgment ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 30, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • September 30, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 25, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • July 25, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 12, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.