U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03227
  • Case Name: McNair v. North Carolina Department of Public Safety et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Stay of Mandate]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Document]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 06, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 03, 2023: [Document]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice-other]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Document]
  • August 24, 2022: [Document]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 10, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 08, 2022: [Permanent Injunction]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 13, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 13, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 12, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.