U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01656-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Santos
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 15, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 14, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 14, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.