U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01639-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shaw
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 02, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 26, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • July 12, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.