U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01637-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Richard
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • December 12, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 26, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 26, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • July 12, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.