U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01643-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walker
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 02, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 03, 2022: [Document]
  • August 03, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Defendant Failed to Appear, Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
  • July 13, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 13, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • July 12, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.