U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01642-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Toske
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 27, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 12, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.