U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01640-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Simmons
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 04, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • July 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 18, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 12, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.