U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01628-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Larralde
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Judgment ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
October, 2022
  • October 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 30, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 30, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 31, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 31, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • July 31, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 12, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.