U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mj-01110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order Finding Probable Cause]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 22, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Complaint ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.