U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mj-01109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Annis
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • October 17, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 12, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 08, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 05, 2022: [Document]
  • August 05, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 05, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 13, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.