U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 15, 2022: [Transcript]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Commitment to Another District]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 20, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 15, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2022: [Text Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 13, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 13, 2022: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
  • July 13, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • July 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
  • July 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Arrest - Rule 5]
  • July 12, 2022: [Case Sealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.