U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03229
  • Case Name: Carrington et al v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 26, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 26, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • July 22, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 14, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.