U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03234
  • Case Name: Blake v. Ishee et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 01, 2022: [Mail Returned]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 28, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • July 20, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 18, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • July 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 14, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 14, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • July 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.