U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03233
  • Case Name: Hart v. Warren Correctional Institution
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 02, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • April 23, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 23, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Document ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appendix to the Statement of Facts]
  • April 23, 2025: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • April 23, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • April 18, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 17, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 17, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Document ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Entry of Default]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Remark]
  • December 12, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 02, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 02, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 09, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order]
  • July 19, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 14, 2022: [Complaint]
  • July 14, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.