U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03232
  • Case Name: Wilkins v. Stone et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • October 11, 2024: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 09, 2024: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Summons Issued]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 22, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 19, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 19, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • July 19, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 14, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.