U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02123
  • Case Name: Parks v. State of North Carolina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 01, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 14, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.