U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01662-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Francis
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Judgment ]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • December 20, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • August 04, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 15, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.