U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01663-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whitehead-Ray
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 19, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2022
  • December 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 03, 2022: [Document]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Defendant Failed to Appear, Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
  • July 20, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • July 20, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • July 15, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.