U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03238
  • Case Name: McGriff El v. Pierce et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Case Submitted]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • January 03, 2023: [Motion Referred]
  • January 03, 2023: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Document]
  • August 23, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 18, 2022: [Complaint]
  • July 18, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.