U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Arraignment ]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 12, 2022: [Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Bond ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 18, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • July 18, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.