U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rehmann
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 17, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 17, 2022: [Return of Property/PreTrial ]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Bond ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 18, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • July 18, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.