U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scott
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 15, 2022: [Add Counts]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 03, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 19, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 18, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • July 18, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.