U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03239
  • Case Name: Taylor v. Department of Public Safety et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 03, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Document]
  • November 23, 2022: [Declaration]
  • November 23, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 08, 2022: [Request for Production of Documents]
  • November 08, 2022: [Document]
  • November 08, 2022: [Interrogatories Propounded]
  • November 08, 2022: [Request for Admissions]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 17, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 12, 2022: [Document]
  • October 12, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 06, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 30, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 26, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 07, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 02, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 11, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 01, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 01, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • July 29, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 29, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • July 29, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • July 29, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 18, 2022: [Complaint]
  • July 18, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.