U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03241
  • Case Name: Hunter v. Internal Revenue Service
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • September 08, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 24, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • August 16, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 11, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 03, 2022: [Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 19, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.