U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03240
  • Case Name: Steepleton v. Jones et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 20, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • July 20, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • July 20, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 19, 2022: [Complaint]
  • July 19, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.