U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01653-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Freibert
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Judgment ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 04, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 04, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • July 19, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.