U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01668-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gibbs
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Text Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 07, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 06, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • September 02, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 02, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Detention]
  • September 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 01, 2022: [Arrest ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Complaint ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.