U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02128
  • Case Name: Oaks v. Warden et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Document]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 21, 2022: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • October 20, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 20, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2241]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 21, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 21, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.