U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03242
  • Case Name: Hunter v. Warden
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • October 07, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 05, 2022: [Mail Returned]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.