U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mc-00001
  • Case Name: Willis v. Jones County Public Schools et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Document]
  • December 29, 2022: [Document]
  • December 19, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 19, 2022: [Opinion from USCA]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • September 07, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
  • September 02, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 01, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • September 01, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • August 22, 2022: [Document]
  • August 17, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Self-Representation]
  • August 17, 2022: [Document]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 21, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.