U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03243
  • Case Name: Fraley v. Haley
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 12, 2023: [Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 26, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • July 26, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • July 22, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 21, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.