U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01683-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roe
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Judgment ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 04, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 22, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.