U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01681-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moten
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 04, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 03, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 22, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.