U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01678-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holland
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 02, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 03, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 22, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.