U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01675-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 10, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 03, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • August 03, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.