U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01684-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Richardson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • August 08, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 22, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.